HI SB1213 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1213

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals sections 264-19, 266-2.3, and 266-22, Hawaii Revised Statutes, for the purpose of deleting obsolete or unnecessary provisions. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
2021-02-19SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 539) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC.
2021-02-18SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
2021-02-03SenateRe-Referred to TRS, WAM/JDC.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to TRS, JDC.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1059 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1213 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback