GA SB231 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 10 of Chapter 21 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to Georgia Driver's Education Commission, so as to extend the sunset provisions for the additional sums collected on fines for the purpose of funding the commission and driver education and training in Georgia; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Driver's Education Commission; additional sums collected on fines; extend the sunset provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Barry Loudermilk [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] |
Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] | Rep. Tom Rice [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #409 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House Vote #343 (Y: 154 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #144 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House Vote #343 (Y: 154 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #144 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 229 | |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub |
2013-03-22 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-03-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-11 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |