GA SB158 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 28 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to fiscal bills generally, so as to provide exceptions to the requirements for fiscal notes regarding legislation; to provide for the contents of fiscal notes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
General Assembly; fiscal bills; requirements for fiscal notes regarding legislation; provide exceptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #164 - Passage As Amended (Y: 47 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2009-03-23 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-17 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-12 | House First Readers | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-03 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-17 | Senate Read and Referred |