GA SB102 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 35-3-34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to disclosure and dissemination of criminal records to private persons and businesses, resulting responsibility and liability of issuing center, and provision of certain information to the FBI in conjunction with the National Instant Criminal Background Check System, so as to increase the fees for providing certain criminal records; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Criminal Records; increase the fees for providing certain records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #111 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2009-03-09 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-09 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-05 | House First Readers | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-02-26 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-05 | Senate Read and Referred |