GA HB987 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 17 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to miscellaneous provisions relative to the Peace Officers' Annuity and Benefit Fund, so as to provide that a member of the fund who ceases to be employed as a peace officer shall have a duty to so notify the retirement fund immediately; to provide for a cessation of membership; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Peace Officers' Annuity and Benefit Fund; member who ceases to be employed shall notify the retirement fund immediately; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #782 - Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Vote #596 - Passage (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Vote #596 - Passage (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 690 | |
2012-05-01 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-05 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-17 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-16 | House First Readers |