GA HB1162 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Effective Date 2024-04-22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Effective Date 2024-04-22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revenue and taxation, so as to revise the terms "Internal Revenue Code" and "Internal Revenue Code of 1986" and thereby incorporate certain provisions of the federal law into Georgia law; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Internal Revenue Code and Internal Revenue Code of 1986; revise terms and incorporate certain provisions of federal law into Georgia law
Sponsors
Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. John Carson [R] |
Rep. Charles Martin [R] | Sen. Billy Hickman [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #637 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Passage: House Vote #477 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Passage: House Vote #477 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Effective Date 2024-04-22 | |
2024-04-22 | Act 408 | |
2024-04-22 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-06 | House | House Hopper |