GA HB1099 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act revising, superseding, and consolidating the laws relative to the governing authority of DeKalb County and creating a chairman and board of commissioners of said county, approved March 8, 1956 (Ga. L. 1956, p. 3237), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 9, 1981 (Ga. L. 1981, p. 4304), so as to change the composition of the governing authority; to abolish the office of chief executive officer; to provide for a commission chairperson to be elected at large; to shorten certain terms of office; to provide for elections and new terms of office; to provide for term limits; to provide for a county manager; to provide for related matters; to provide for a referendum and effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
DeKalb County; change composition of the governing authority; provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-29 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-26 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/48843 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/159091 |