FL S7086 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising terminology regarding voting rights restoration to conform to the State Constitution; requiring the voting disqualification of certain felons to be removed and voting rights restored pursuant to s. 4, Art. VI of the State Constitution; authorizing the supervisor of elections to verify whether a person who has been convicted of a felony offense is eligible to register to vote, including if he or she has completed all the terms of his or her sentence; prohibiting a person from being charged or convicted for certain violations, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting Rights Restoration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-05-02SenateRetained on Calendar
2019-05-01SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2019-04-30SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-25SenateCS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2019-04-24SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-23SenateCS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 6
2019-04-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-10SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2019-04-10SenateNow in Rules
2019-04-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-08SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 3 NAYS 2
2019-04-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/08/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-27SenateIntroduced
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Judiciary; Rules
2019-03-27SenateFiled
2019-03-25SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Criminal Justice; YEAS 3 NAYS 2
2019-03-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/25/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-03-20SenateSubmitted for consideration by Criminal Justice

Same As/Similar To

H7089 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
S7066 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-162

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
104011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
940061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944292Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94724Amended CodeSee Bill Text
948041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
95129Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97052Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
980751Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7086
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7086/BillText/pb/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7086/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7086/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7086/BillText/c2/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7086/Amendment/703932/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7086/Amendment/243298/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7086/Amendment/783410/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7086/Amendment/309960/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7086/Amendment/776780/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7086/Amendment/631578/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7086/Amendment/110742/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7086/Amendment/964838/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7086/Amendment/659508/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7086/Amendment/674650/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7086/Amendment/612578/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7086/Amendment/370656/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7086/Amendment/672790/HTML

Bill Comments

feedback