FL H7089 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires uniform statewide voter registration application to be designed to elicit specified information from applicant so certain felons are not required to reveal certain information; provides for termination of voting disabilities arising from certain felony convictions; requires DOS to identify registered voters & take specified actions; prohibits person from being charged or convicted for certain violations; provides that voting disqualification arising from certain felony convictions shall terminate upon completion of all terms of sentence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting Rights Restoration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#203 (Y: 71 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#191 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Rules
2019-04-24SenateIn Messages
2019-04-24HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 71 NAYS 45
2019-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-23HouseAmendment(s) failed (239235, 583329, 631771, 709273, 719965, 861419) 788
2019-04-23HouseAmendment(s) adopted (169529) 787
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/19
2019-04-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-10HouseCS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2019-04-10HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-09HouseCS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 6
2019-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-04-04HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-04-04HouseFavorable by State Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 6
2019-04-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/04/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-21HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee
2019-03-20HouseIntroduced
2019-03-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S7086 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
S7066 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-162

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
104011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
940061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944292Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
95129Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97052Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98075Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7089
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7089/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7089/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7089/BillText/e1/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7089/Amendment/009189/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7089/Amendment/169529/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7089/Amendment/719965/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7089/Amendment/831597/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7089/Amendment/076107/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7089/Amendment/583329/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7089/Amendment/111275/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7089/Amendment/140117/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7089/Amendment/631771/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7089/Amendment/861419/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7089/Amendment/239235/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7089/Amendment/709273/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7089/Amendment/839957/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7089/Amendment/685559/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7089/Vote/HouseVote_h07089c1191.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7089/Vote/HouseVote_h07089e1203.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback