FL S7052 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Florida K-12 Education Tax Credit Program Trust Fund within the Department of Education; providing the purpose of the trust fund and the source of funds; exempting the trust fund from the general revenue service charge; requiring any balance in the trust fund at the end of any fiscal year to remain in the trust fund and be available for carrying out the purpose of the trust fund; providing for future review and termination or re-creation of the trust fund, etc.
Title
Florida K-12 Education Tax Credit Program Trust Fund/Department of Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations; YEAS 14 NAYS 5 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/04/21, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
S48 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7045 (Ch. 2021-27)