FL S7008 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-44
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-44
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amending a provision relating to an exemption from public records requirements for involuntary assessment and stabilization, court orders, related records, and personal identifying information regarding substance abuse impaired persons; removing the scheduled repeal date of the exemption, etc.
Title
OGSR/Substance Abuse Impaired Persons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#760 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Chapter No. 2022-44 | |
2022-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-03 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-03 | House | Substituted for HB 7011 |
2022-02-28 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-01-19 | House | In Messages |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/19/22 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/13/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Filed |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2021-11-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 11/30/21, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2021-11-22 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H7011 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 7008
H1157 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
S1846 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Messages
H1157 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
S1846 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Messages