FL S1846 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting from public records requirements a respondent's name in certain documents at trial and on appeal; expanding exemptions from public records requirements for certain petitions, court orders, and related records to include applications for voluntary and involuntary mental health examinations and substance abuse treatment, respectively; revising the date for future legislative review and repeal of the exemptions; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Respondent's Name
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Messages |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-03-01 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-01 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/22 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/07/22, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-02 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/01/22, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1844 (Related) 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-41
H1157 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
H1143 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
H7011 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 7008
S7008 (Similar To) 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-44
H1157 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
H1143 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
H7011 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 7008
S7008 (Similar To) 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-44
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
394 | 464 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6760 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |