FL H1157 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-26 - Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts from public records requirements respondent's name in certain documents at trial & on appeal; expands certain exemptions from public records requirements to include applications for voluntary & involuntary mental health examinations & substance abuse treatment; expands certain exceptions; authorizes court to use respondent's name for certain purposes; revises applicability; revises date for future legislative review & repeal of exemptions; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Court Records

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-25 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-26HouseNow in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2022-01-26HouseReported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
2022-01-25HouseFavorable by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
2022-01-21HouseAdded to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseNow in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
2022-01-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1143 (Related) 2022-01-25 - Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
H7011 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Added to Second Reading Calendar
S7008 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - In Messages
S1846 (Same As) 2022-01-27 - On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/01/22, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
S1844 (Similar To) 2022-01-27 - On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/01/22, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
394464Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976760Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback