FL S7004 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7009 (Ch. 2019-28), CS/CS/CS/SB 248 (Ch. 2019-12)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amending provisions relating to an exemption from the public records requirements for personal identifying and location information and photographs of certain Department of Health personnel; removing the scheduled repeal of the exemption, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/Department of Health Personnel

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7009 (Ch. 2019-28), CS/CS/CS/SB 248 (Ch. 2019-12)
2019-03-27SenateSubstituted HB 7009
2019-03-27SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-21SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-03-21SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-18SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/21/19
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-03-13SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-03-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/13/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-13SenateNow in Rules
2019-02-12SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2019-02-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/12/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-01-09SenateFiled
2019-01-07SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-12-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/07/19, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-12-20SenateSubmitted for consideration by Health Policy

Same As/Similar To

H203 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 248 (Ch. 2019-12), HB 7009 (Ch. 2019-28)
S248 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Chapter No. 2019-12, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7009 (Ch. 2019-28)
H7009 (Same As) 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-28, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 248 (Ch. 2019-12)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback