FL H0203 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 248 (Ch. 2019-12), HB 7009 (Ch. 2019-28)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Defines term "home address" for purposes of public records exemptions for personal identifying & location information of certain agency personnel & their family members; exempts personal identifying & location information of active or former civilian personnel employed by law enforcement agency, & of spouses & children of such personnel, from public records requirements; authorizes certain persons to request release of exempt information in specified manner; provides for legislative review & repeal of exemptions; provides statements of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Civilian Personnel Employed by Law Enforcement Agency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 248 (Ch. 2019-12), HB 7009 (Ch. 2019-28)
2019-04-10HouseSubstituted CS/CS/CS/SB 248
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-07HouseFavorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseCS by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/07/19, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-25HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-02-20HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-02-20HouseCS by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-02-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 02/20/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-02-08HouseNow in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseFavorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/06/19, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-01-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S248 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Chapter No. 2019-12, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7009 (Ch. 2019-28)
S7004 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7009 (Ch. 2019-28), CS/CS/CS/SB 248 (Ch. 2019-12)
H7009 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-28, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 248 (Ch. 2019-12)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback