FL H7009 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-28, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 248 (Ch. 2019-12)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Removes scheduled repeal of exemption from public record requirements for certain personal identifying & location information of specified personnel of DOH, & spouses & children thereof.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/Identification and Location Information/Department of Health

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Chapter No. 2019-28, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 248 (Ch. 2019-12)
2019-05-14 Approved by Governor
2019-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-03HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-03-27SenatePassed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2019-03-27SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-27SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-27SenateSubstituted for SB 7004
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-03-27SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-03-26SenateReceived
2019-03-25SenateReferred to Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-03-21SenateIn Messages
2019-03-21HouseImmediately certified
2019-03-21HousePassed; YEAS 108 NAYS 0
2019-03-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-20HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-03-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/20/19
2019-03-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-05HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/05/19, 4:30 pm, Morris Hall
2019-02-21HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-02-20HouseFavorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-02-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 02/20/19, 4:00 pm, Mashburn Hall
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-01-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S7004 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7009 (Ch. 2019-28), CS/CS/CS/SB 248 (Ch. 2019-12)
H203 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 248 (Ch. 2019-12), HB 7009 (Ch. 2019-28)
S248 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Chapter No. 2019-12, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7009 (Ch. 2019-28)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback