FL S0248 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Chapter No. 2019-12, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7009 (Ch. 2019-28)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding exemptions from public records requirements for agency personnel information by defining the term "home addresses" for purposes of public records exemptions for personal identifying and location information of certain agency personnel and their family members; exempting personal identifying and location information of active or former civilian personnel employed by a law enforcement agency, and of spouses and children of such personnel, from public records requirements; providing for legislative review and repeal of the exemptions; providing statements of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Civilian Personnel Employed by a Law Enforcement Agency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#54 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29 Chapter No. 2019-12, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7009 (Ch. 2019-28)
2019-04-26 Approved by Governor
2019-04-22 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-18SenateOrdered enrolled
2019-04-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-10HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 203
2019-04-04HouseReceived
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-04-04HouseReferred to Calendar
2019-04-03HouseIn Messages
2019-03-27SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 1
2019-03-27SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-21SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-03-21SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-18SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/21/19
2019-03-14SenateCS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2019-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-03-13SenateCS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
2019-03-13SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-13SenateCS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-03-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/13/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-08SenateNow in Rules
2019-03-06SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-06SenateCS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2019-03-05SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/06/19, 10:30 am, 301 Senate Building
2019-02-13SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2019-02-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-02-11SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2019-02-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/11/19, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-01-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/04/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Meeting cancelled
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-01-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H203 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 248 (Ch. 2019-12), HB 7009 (Ch. 2019-28)
S7004 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7009 (Ch. 2019-28), CS/CS/CS/SB 248 (Ch. 2019-12)
H7009 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-28, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 248 (Ch. 2019-12)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11907Amended CodeSee Bill Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback