FL S2722 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - CS combines this bill with SB 2272 -SJ 00552; CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00552; Original bill laid on Table, refer to combined CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211) -SJ 00552
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - CS combines this bill with SB 2272 -SJ 00552; CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00552; Original bill laid on Table, refer to combined CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211) -SJ 00552
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
(THIS BILL IS COMBINED IN CS/CS/S2272 & CS/S2722) Provides that pain-management clinics are business establishments that are required to be registered with the DOH. Requires all privately owned pain-management clinics, or offices that primarily engage in the treatment of pain by prescribing or dispensing controlled substance medications or by employing a physician who is primarily engaged in the same, to register with DOH, etc.
Title
Pain Management [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | CS combines this bill with SB 2272 -SJ 00552; CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00552; Original bill laid on Table, refer to combined CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211) -SJ 00552 | |
2010-04-08 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/13/10, 9:30 am, 37-S | |
2010-04-01 | Now in Criminal Justice -SJ 00350 | |
2010-03-29 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-26 | CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00350; CS read 1st time on 03/30/10 -SJ 00367 | |
2010-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 03/26/10, 8:00 am, 412-K | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00230 | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to Health Regulation; Criminal Justice; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00230 | |
2010-02-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0225 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
H0373 (Similar To) 2010-02-25 - Withdrawn from Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Health & Family Services Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 00037
H0671 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
S0646 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
S0804 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
S2272 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-211
H1499 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
H0373 (Similar To) 2010-02-25 - Withdrawn from Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Health & Family Services Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 00037
H0671 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
S0646 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
S0804 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
S2272 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-211
H1499 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0456 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0456 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0456 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0458 | 309 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0458 | 3265 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0458 | 327 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0458 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0459 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0459 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0459 | 0137 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0459 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0465 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0465 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0465 | 0276 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |