FL H1499 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises requirements for practitioner training on controlled substances; provides additional acts that constitute grounds for disciplinary actions against health professional licensees; requires registration of pain-management clinics with DOH; provides application requirements; requires fingerprinting & criminal records checks of certain persons affiliated with pain-management clinics, etc.
Title
Controlled Substances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211) | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Health & Family Services Policy Council -HJ 00257 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00134 | |
2010-03-01 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0373 (Similar To) 2010-02-25 - Withdrawn from Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Health & Family Services Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 00037
H0671 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
S0646 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
S0804 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
S2272 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-211
S2722 (Similar To) 2010-04-13 - CS combines this bill with SB 2272 -SJ 00552; CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00552; Original bill laid on Table, refer to combined CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211) -SJ 00552
H0225 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
H0671 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
S0646 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
S0804 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
S2272 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-211
S2722 (Similar To) 2010-04-13 - CS combines this bill with SB 2272 -SJ 00552; CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00552; Original bill laid on Table, refer to combined CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211) -SJ 00552
H0225 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0456 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0456 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0456 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0456 | 069 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0456 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0456 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0458 | 309 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0458 | 3265 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0458 | 327 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0459 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0459 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0459 | 0137 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0893 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0893 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |