FL H0225 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Introduced on October 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requires AHCA to contract with multistate electronic prescribing network to provide certain agencies with access to certain controlled substance information; revises requirements for registration of pain-management clinics; requires DOH to refuse to register pain-management clinics under certain circumstances; specifies additional grounds for disciplinary action against certain licensed practitioners & community pharmacy permittees, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled Substances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
2010-04-23 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading -HJ 00972
2010-04-21 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading -HJ 00815
2010-04-20 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading -HJ 00776
2010-04-16 CS read 1st time on 04/16/10 -HJ 00726; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00732
2010-04-09 CS/CS by- Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); YEAS 7 NAYS 5 -HJ 00732
2010-04-07 On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations (CGHC), 04/09/10, 11:00 am, Webster Hall
2010-04-02 On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations (CGHC), 04/06/10, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall --Not considered
2010-03-24 Original reference(s) removed: Health & Family Services Policy Council; CS referred to Health Care Appropriations (CGHC) -HJ 00395; Now in Health Care Appropriations (CGHC)
2010-03-18 CS read 1st time on 03/18/10 -HJ 00336; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Health Care Services Policy (HFPC); Health & Family Services Policy Council -HJ 00027, -HJ 00227; Original reference(s)- removed: Health Care Services Policy (HFPC) -HJ 00227; Referred to- Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Health & Family Services Policy Council -HJ 00027, -HJ 00227; On Committee agenda-- Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), 02/02/10, 9:00 am, Morris Hall --Temporarily deferred; PCS on Committee agenda-- Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), 03/01/10, 3:15 pm, Morris Hall; CS by Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); YEAS 12 NAYS 1 -HJ 00342
2010-03-01 CS by Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); YEAS 12 NAYS 1
2010-02-22 PCS on Committee agenda-- Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), 03/01/10, 3:15 pm, Morris Hall
2010-01-26 On Committee agenda-- Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), 02/02/10, 9:00 am, Morris Hall --Temporarily deferred
2009-12-10 Original reference(s)- removed: Health Care Services Policy (HFPC); Referred to- Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Health & Family Services Policy Council
2009-11-01 Referred to Health Care Services Policy (HFPC); Health & Family Services Policy Council
2009-10-14 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S2722 (Similar To) 2010-04-13 - CS combines this bill with SB 2272 -SJ 00552; CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00552; Original bill laid on Table, refer to combined CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211) -SJ 00552
H0373 (Similar To) 2010-02-25 - Withdrawn from Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Health & Family Services Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 00037
H0671 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
H1499 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
S0646 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
S0804 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
S2272 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-211

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
04080513Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0458303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0458309Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0458311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0458313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04583135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04583137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04583145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0458331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0458345Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0459005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0459015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0459021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0465018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0465023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04650276Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0499028Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback