FL S2628 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates an exemption from public records requirements for petitions to determine incapacity. Provides for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption. Provides a statement of public necessity.
Title
Public Records/Petitions to Determine Incapacity [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00224 | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs -SJ 00224 | |
2010-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1431 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC)
H1435 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
S2624 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
S2626 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
H1433 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
H1435 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
S2624 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
S2626 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
H1433 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council