FL H1431 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides purposes for & construction of jurisdictional provisions; provides for treatment of foreign countries for specified purposes; provides for communication & cooperation between courts; provides for jurisdiction; provides for determination of whether court is an appropriate forum, etc.
Title
Adult Guardianship
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC) | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable by Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00379; Now in Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC) -HJ 00379 | |
2010-03-18 | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), 03/22/10, 3:15 pm, Reed Hall | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00256 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00128 | |
2010-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2488 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
S2624 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
S2628 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
H1433 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
H1435 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
S2626 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
S2624 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
S2628 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
H1433 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
H1435 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
S2626 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0744 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0744 | 211 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0744 | 2112 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0744 | 2113 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0744 | 2114 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0744 | 2115 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0744 | 2123 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0744 | 2126 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0744 | 2127 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0744 | 2129 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0744 | 3201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |