FL S2626 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Redesignates part II of ch. 744, F.S., as "Venue and Jurisdiction." Provides purposes for and construction of jurisdictional provisions. Provides for treatment of foreign countries for specified purposes. Requires that factual information included in a petition alleging incapacity not include any information that is confidential or for which the alleged incapacitated person maintains a right to privacy, etc.
Title
Adult Guardianship [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00223 | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00223 | |
2010-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1433 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
H1435 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
S2488 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
S2624 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
S2628 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
H1431 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC)
H1435 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
S2488 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
S2624 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
S2628 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
H1431 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0744 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0744 | 211 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0744 | 2112 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0744 | 2113 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0744 | 2114 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0744 | 2115 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0744 | 2123 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0744 | 2126 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0744 | 2127 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0744 | 2129 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0744 | 3201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |