FL S2368 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military Affairs and Domestic Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military Affairs and Domestic Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits restrictions on the reporting of certain immigration status information by public employees. Prohibits certain local governmental restrictions on communicating or cooperating with federal officials concerning a person's citizenship or immigration status.
Title
Illegal Immigration [GPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Military Affairs and Domestic Security | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00204 | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Military Affairs and Domestic Security; Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary -SJ 00204 | |
2010-02-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0503 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Policy Council
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0111 | 076 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0125 | 582 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0166 | 04935 | New Code | See Bill Text |