FL S2054 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-229; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)

Summary

Designates Doolittle Raiders Highway in Okaloosa and Walton Counties. Designates Beach Highway in Walton County. Designates K. Earl Durden Highway in Bay County. Directs the Department of Transportation to erect markers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Road Designations [CPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-11 Chapter No. 2010-229; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
2010-05-12 Approved by Governor
2010-04-27 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -SJ 00924
2010-04-23 Ordered enrolled -SJ 00802
2010-04-23 Substituted for CS/HB 1113 -HJ 00937; Read 2nd time -HJ 00937; Read 3rd time -HJ 00937; CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 00937
2010-04-22 Received -HJ 00919; Referred to Calendar -HJ 00919
2010-04-15 In Messages
2010-04-08 Read 3rd time -SJ 00518; CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 -SJ 00518
2010-04-06 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00509
2010-03-30 Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00345
2010-03-25 Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-03-24 CS by- Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00345; CS read 1st time on 03/25/10 -SJ 00347
2010-03-19 On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/24/10, 1:15 pm, 37-S
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Transportation -SJ 00139
2010-03-01 Referred to Transportation -SJ 00139
2010-02-16 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0839 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)
H1113 (Similar To) 2010-04-23 - Substituted CS/SB 2054; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229), HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230) -HJ 00937
S0520 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00585; Substituted HB 5 -SJ 00585; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229) -SJ 00585
H0005 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-230; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback