FL H1113 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-23 - Substituted CS/SB 2054; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229), HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230) -HJ 00937
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Designates Doolittle Raiders Highway in Okaloosa & Walton Counties, Beach Highway in Walton County, and K. Earl Durden Highway in Bay County; directs DOT to erect suitable markers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Road Designations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-23 Substituted CS/SB 2054; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229), HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230) -HJ 00937
2010-04-07 Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00647; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00647
2010-04-05 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/07/10, 8:00 am, 404-H
2010-03-23 Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00378
2010-03-22 CS read 1st time on 03/22/10 -HJ 00356; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-16 CS by Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 00359
2010-03-12 On Committee agenda-- Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED), 03/16/10, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
2010-03-10 Favorable by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00268; Now in Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED) -HJ 00268
2010-03-08 On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 03/10/10, 8:30 am, 404-H
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00100
2010-03-01 Referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2010-02-17 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0839 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)
S2054 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-229; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S0520 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00585; Substituted HB 5 -SJ 00585; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229) -SJ 00585
H0005 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-230; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback