FL S2036 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that certain information relating to the outsourcing or privatization of an agency function which is expressly required by law is not required to be included in the agency's legislative budget request until after the contract for such function is executed; requiring an agency to publicly publish the business case prepared for an outsourcing project on the agency's website; providing that certain requirements that apply to Department of Corrections' contracts do not apply to contracts for outsourcing or privatizing the operation and maintenance of correctional facilities which are expressly required by law, etc.
Title
Outsourcing or Privatization of Agency Functions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Budget | |
2012-01-24 | CS by Rules read 1st time -SJ 276 | |
2012-01-24 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 01/25/12, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered | |
2012-01-23 | Now in Budget | |
2012-01-23 | CS by- Rules; YEAS 9 NAYS 5 -SJ 265 | |
2012-01-20 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/23/12, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-20 | Introduced -SJ 254 | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to Rules -SJ 254 | |
2012-01-18 | SPB 7170 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2036) by Rules |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
216 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 0571 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |