FL S2022 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8013 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8013 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing March 23, 2021, as "Florida Gulf Coast University Day" in Florida, etc.
Title
Florida Gulf Coast University Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8013 (Adopted) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H8013 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - Adopted by Publication; companion bill(s) passed, see SR 2022 (Adopted)
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2022 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2022/BillText/Filed/HTML |