FL S1812 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the regional counsel to provide pre-petition legal representation to indigent parents in certain child welfare matters; authorizing the regional counsel to initiate or appear in specified civil actions; providing a mechanism for determining indigency by a regional counsel; requiring child protective investigators to provide information regarding the right of certain persons to representation by the regional counsel, etc.
Title
Representation Provided by the Offices of Criminal Conflict and Civil Regional Counsel in Child Welfare Matters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1613 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1812 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1812/BillText/Filed/HTML |