FL S1740 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a veteran who is involuntarily examined under the Baker Act or involuntarily assessed under the Hal S. Marchman Alcohol and Other Drug Services Act to be released to a United States Department of Veterans Affairs hospital to ensure coordination of treatment, etc.
Title
Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services for Veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
394 | 463 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6758 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1740 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1740/BillText/Filed/HTML |