FL S1738 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing an early learning coalition to refuse to contract with certain private prekindergarten providers, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voluntary Prekindergarten Education Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-08SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education
2018-02-07SenateCS by Education read 1st time
2018-02-07SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-06SenateCS by Education; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1297 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
H7055 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-6

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100288Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback