FL S1694 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that the Department of Environmental Protection and the St. Johns River Water Management District consider mitigation on specified land as meeting cumulative impact requirements under certain conditions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mitigation Activities Within the St. Johns River Water Management District

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Community Affairs; Rules
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1149 (Similar To) 2018-04-06 - Vetoed by Governor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
373414Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback