FL H1149 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Vetoed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directing the Department of Environmental Protection and water management districts to reissue the construction phase of an expired environmental resource permit under certain conditions; encouraging the development of aquifer recharge for reuse implementation; requiring counties and municipalities to address contamination of recyclable material in specified contracts; providing an exemption from certain requirements for mitigation areas created by a local government under a permit issued before a specified date and for certain mitigation banks, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental Regulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#775 (Y: 86 N: 21 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-06 Vetoed by Governor
2018-03-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-09HouseOrdered enrolled 1211
2018-03-09SenateCS passed; YEAS 27 NAYS 10
2018-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-09SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-09SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 1308
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-09SenateWithdrawn from Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Community Affairs; Appropriations
2018-03-06SenateReceived
2018-03-06SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Community Affairs; Appropriations
2018-03-05SenateIn Messages
2018-03-05HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 86 NAYS 21
2018-03-05HouseAmendment(s) adopted (511723)
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time 863
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseAmendment(s) adopted (816455)
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-26HouseCS/CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time
2018-02-26HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-22HouseCS/CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 7
2018-02-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/22/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2018-02-06HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-02-06HouseFavorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
2018-02-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/06/18, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-26HouseNow in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-25HouseCS by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-25HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-23HouseCS by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1
2018-01-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 12:00 pm, 12 HOB
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-07HouseReferred to Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1308 (Same As) 2018-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1149
H837 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
H7063 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S244 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S992 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
S1694 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
373250Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373413Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3734135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373414Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3734598Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403064Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403067Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403087Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4031838Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4031839Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403813Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1149
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1149/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1149/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1149/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1149/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1149/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1149/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1149/Amendment/404129/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1149/Amendment/769939/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1149/Amendment/816455/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1149/Amendment/246447/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1149/Vote/HouseVote_h01149e1775.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1149/Vote/SenateVote_h01149e2004.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback