FL H7063 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises, creates, & repeals various provisions relating to acquisition, management, & disposition of conservation lands; beach management; greenways & trails; arthropod control; water supply facilities, public water systems, & domestic wastewater systems; water resource development & capital improvement projects; state park passes; distribution & use of funds from Florida Forever Trust Fund & Land Acquisition Trust Fund; rural-lands-protection easement programs; reservoir projects; basin management action plans; beneficial uses & management of stormwater; LAKEWATCH Program; provides statement of important state interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied on Calendar
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-26HouseCS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time 678
2018-02-24HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-22HouseCS/CS by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0
2018-02-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/22/18, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2018-02-13HouseCS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time 562
2018-02-13HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2018-02-12HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-06HouseCS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-02-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/06/18, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2018-01-29HouseIntroduced
2018-01-29HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1353 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
S370 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
S992 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
H131 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee
S174 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
H1149 (Similar To) 2018-04-06 - Vetoed by Governor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100449Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12535Amended CodeSee Bill Text
161101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
161161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633177Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1660452Amended CodeSee Bill Text
203315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
215618Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2530251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
253027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
253034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
258014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25903Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259037Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2600142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
260016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373089Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373139Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3731391Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373199Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3734598Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373713Amended CodeSee Bill Text
375041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
380508Amended CodeSee Bill Text
380510Amended CodeSee Bill Text
388261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403067Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403087Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4030891Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403412Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403892Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403893Amended CodeSee Bill Text
570715Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57076Amended CodeSee Bill Text
589065Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback