FL H0131 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises criteria for state & local participation in authorized projects & studies relating to beach management & erosion control; revises procedures for prioritizing & funding beach restoration, beach management, & inlet management projects; requires certain funds from Land Acquisition Trust Fund be used for beach preservation & restoration projects.
Title
Coastal Management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-09-14 | House | Referred to Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-09-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
161 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
161 | 143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
161 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
375 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/131 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/131/BillText/Filed/PDF |