FL S1662 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the clerk of the court to transmit certified copies of the disposition of criminal history records for criminal cases disposed of before a certain date to the Department of Law Enforcement on a specified schedule; providing that transmission of the certified copy to the department seals the criminal history record, etc.
Title
Automatic Sealing of Criminal History Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H881 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1662 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1662/BillText/Filed/HTML |