FL S1606 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that providers of certain services to a resident of a nursing home facility have the right to have reasonable access to the resident which is free of charge; prohibiting an assisted living facility from charging providers of certain services to a resident for reasonable access to the resident; requiring that reasons for a resident's relocation from an assisted living facility be provided to the resident or the resident's legal representative, etc.
Title
Long-term Care Facility Residents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1606 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1606/BillText/Filed/HTML |