FL S1606 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the Florida Motion Picture Capital Corporation to encourage the use of this state as a site for scripted productions by providing financing to certain productions; requiring productions to use a bonded third-party collection account management firm; requiring productions to carry an insurance package meeting certain standards, etc.
Title
Film and Television Production
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-26 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 2 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/20/18, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1604 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H341 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
H343 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
H341 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
H343 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 1259 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |