FL S1584 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a manufacturer who possesses a vendor's license to sell, transport, and deliver malt beverages to vendors under certain circumstances; revising alcoholic beverage inventory requirements for warehouse space owned or leased by certain distributors; revising the percentage of licensed vendors a distributor must sell to in certain locations to be presumed to be selling to licensed vendors generally; prohibiting certain entities and persons from directly or indirectly assisting or providing specified items, moneys, or services to a licensed vendor, etc.
Title
Beverage Law
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1153 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
H1165 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H1165 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
561 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 5101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
563 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1584 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1584/BillText/Filed/HTML |