FL S1584 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health and Human Services Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health and Human Services Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the national accreditation of human service providers in lieu of certain licensure requirements. Provides for state agency inspection and monitoring for certain purposes. Requires the DMS to establish an electronic document vault for the storage of administrative documents required in a regulatory environment. Requires state agencies to review all provider requirements and submit a list of such requirements to the Governor, etc.
Title
Procurement of Contractual Services [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2010-04-15 | Now in Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00636 | |
2010-04-14 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00636 | |
2010-04-12 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00525; On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/14/10, 1:00 pm, 110-S | |
2010-04-08 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-07 | CS/CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00525; CS read 1st time on 04/08/10 -SJ 00541 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/07/10, 2:00 pm, 37-S | |
2010-03-23 | Now in Criminal Justice -SJ 00279 | |
2010-03-22 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-18 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00279; CS read 1st time on 03/22/10 -SJ 00292 | |
2010-03-15 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/18/10, 1:00 pm, 401-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Health and Human Services Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00111 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Health and Human Services Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-01-29 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0717 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0216 | 136 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0287 | 0575 | New Code | See Bill Text |