FL S1576 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter No. 2018-87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter No. 2018-87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring specified entities that take receivership of lost or stray dogs or cats to adopt written policies and procedures to ensure that every reasonable effort is made to quickly and reliably return owned animals to their owners; authorizing a court to prohibit certain offenders from owning or having custody or control over animals; revising the ranking of offenses on the offense severity ranking chart of the Criminal Punishment Code, etc.
Title
Animal Welfare
Sponsors
Senate Community Affairs Committee | Senate Agriculture Committee | Sen. Greg Steube [R] | Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
Sen. Dorothy Hukill [R] | Sen. Dana Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#896 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#68 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#68 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Chapter No. 2018-87 | |
2018-03-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2018-03-09 | House | CS passed; YEAS 108 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-09 | House | Received |
2018-03-08 | House | In Messages |
2018-03-08 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Rules |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Criminal Justice |
2018-02-14 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/13/18, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2018-02-07 | Senate | CS by Agriculture read 1st time |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Community Affairs; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | CS by Agriculture; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 02/01/18, 11:30 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Community Affairs; Rules |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H823 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
H473 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S952 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
H473 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S952 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
823 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
828 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |