FL H0823 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that specified entities that take receivership of lost or stray dogs or cats shall adopt written policies & procedures to ensure that every reasonable effort is made to quickly & reliably return animals to their owners; provides requirements for such policies & procedures; requires that specified records be available to public.
Title
Lost or Stray Dogs or Cats
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-08 | House | Referred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-11-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/823 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/823/BillText/Filed/PDF |