FL H0473 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6-1)
Status: Introduced on October 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires certain entities taking in lost or stray dogs or cats to adopt written policies & procedures to ensure every them to owners; provides requirements for such policies & procedures; requires that specified records be available to public; designates portion of act "Ponce's Law"; revises classification of certain animal cruelty offenses; authorizes court to prohibit violators from owning animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal Welfare

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied on Calendar
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-26HouseCS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2018-01-26HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-25HouseCS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2018-01-23HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/25/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-19HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2018-01-18HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/18/18, 1:00 pm, Mashburn Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-06HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-12-06HouseFavorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2017-11-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 12/06/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2017-11-08HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-10-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S952 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
H823 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
S1576 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Chapter No. 2018-87

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
823151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82812Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback