FL S0952 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as "Ponce's Law"; authorizing a court to prohibit certain offenders from owning or having contact with animals, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cruelty to Animals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2017-11-16SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H473 (Similar To) 2018-01-16 - On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/18/18, 1:00 pm, Mashburn Hall

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
82812Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback