FL S1554 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "mental illness" to exclude conditions manifested by dementia or traumatic brain injury; revising eligibility requirements for certain substance abuse and mental health services; revising distribution of funding for substance abuse and mental health services; requiring the Department of Children and Families to request certain medical information from jails, etc.
Title
Substance Abuse and Mental Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1081 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 7012 passed
H1071 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S870 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S1678 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H1229 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
S7012 (Similar To) 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-39
H1071 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S870 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S1678 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H1229 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
S7012 (Similar To) 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-39
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
394 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 674 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 9085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 4012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 4073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1554 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1554/BillText/Filed/HTML |