FL H1229 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises terminology & requirements relating to petitions & court procedures for involuntary treatment & assessment under Baker Act & Marchman Act.
Title
Mental Health and Substance Abuse
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1678 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S870 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H1071 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H1081 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 7012 passed
S1554 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S7012 (Similar To) 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-39
S870 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H1071 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H1081 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 7012 passed
S1554 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S7012 (Similar To) 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-39
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
394 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 459 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4598 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4599 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 461 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 462 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4625 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 463 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 467 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 496 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 499 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 9085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 416 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 675 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6751 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 681 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6811 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6818 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6819 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6822 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 693 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 695 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6951 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6955 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6957 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 697 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6975 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6977 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6978 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 972 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 2007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1229 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1229/BillText/Filed/PDF |