FL S0870 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that respondents with a serious mental illness be informed of the essential elements of recovery and be provided assistance with accessing a continuum of care regimen; authorizing the state to establish that a transfer evaluation was performed by providing the court with a copy of the evaluation before the close of the state's case in chief; revising the requirements for when a person may be ordered for involuntary inpatient placement; authorizing the court or clerk of the court to waive or prohibit any service of process fees for an indigent petitioner; expanding the exemption from the requirement that a respondent be present at a hearing on a petition for involuntary treatment services, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health and Substance Abuse

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Judiciary
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-31SenateNow in Judiciary
2020-01-29SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2020-01-29SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-28SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2020-01-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/28/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-21SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Appropriations
2019-11-12SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1071 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H1081 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 7012 passed
S1554 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S1678 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H1229 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
S7012 (Similar To) 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-39

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
394455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394459Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944598Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944599Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394461Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394462Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394463Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944655Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394467Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394496Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394499Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3949085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397416Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397675Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976751Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397681Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976811Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976819Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976821Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976822Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397693Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397695Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976951Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976955Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976957Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397697Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976971Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976975Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976977Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976978Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409972Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7442007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
790065Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback