FL S1420 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing counties and municipalities, respectively, to access sanitary sewer laterals within their jurisdictions for specified purposes; requiring counties and municipalities to notify private property owners within a specified timeframe if the county or municipality intends to access the owner's sanitary sewer lateral; specifying requirements for counties and municipalities repair work; authorizing a program established by a county or a municipality to evaluate and rehabilitate sanitary sewer laterals on residential and commercial properties to use state or local funds allocated for environmental preservation or the protection of water quality, etc.
Title
Sanitary Sewer Lateral Inspection Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/27/23, 11:30 am, 301 Senate Building |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H661 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 569 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 0481 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |