FL S1398 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7069
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7069
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Re-creating the Florida ABLE Program Trust Fund within the State Board of Administration without modification, etc.
Title
Florida ABLE Program Trust Fund/State Board of Administration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7069 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 7069 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education, 02/08/18, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; Appropriations |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1145 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
H7069 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-79
H7069 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-79
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1398 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1398/BillText/Filed/HTML |