FL H7069 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-79
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-79
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Re-creates Florida ABLE Program Trust Fund within SBA without modification; abrogates provisions relating to termination of trust fund, to conform; provides contingent effective date.
Title
Trust Funds
Sponsors
House Appropriations Committee | House Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | Rep. Larry Ahern [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#667 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#667 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Chapter No. 2018-79 | |
2018-03-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-01 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2018-03-01 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Substituted for SB 1398 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; Appropriations |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; Appropriations |
2018-02-28 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-02-21 | House | CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-20 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/20/18 |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-14 | House | CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2018-02-14 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-14 | House | CS by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/14/18, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1145 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
S1398 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7069
S1398 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7069